Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 28, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 28, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 28, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 28, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 20, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
September 20, 2018 | Motion |
OSC-CONTEMPT -9:30AM (Motion #002) Decided: 09/28/2018GRANTED. RESUBMIT NEW ORDERS. Before Justice: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
August 17, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) FAUGHNAN (Motion Part) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
August 17, 2018 | Motion |
ORDER OF SEIZURE @ 9:30AM (Motion #001) Decided: 09/28/2018GRANTED. RESUBMIT NEW ORDERS. Before Justice: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.