Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Kimberly M Berlin, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 11, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Income Execution wholly satisfied |
||
January 19, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 22, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.