Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Ruben Colon, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Updated Affirmation for resubmitted judgment |
||
September 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
January 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/RUBEN COLON |
||
January 20, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
January 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.