Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Endless Mountains Veterinary Center, Pc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hall, Christopher Ian, against Dickin Memorial Animal Hospital, Pllc, Kimberly Cleveland, represented by Farneti, Gary W, Racketa, Alexander David, Sheppard, Paul Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts Tioga County Supreme Court with Gerald A Keene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald A Keene Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseTioga County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry with Decision and Order | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Supplemental Affidavit of Stephen Laudermilch, DVM |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | SUR-REPLY | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #2) MOL in Further Support of Plaintiff's Application for Injunctive Relief |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Reply Affirmation of Christopher I. Hall, Esq. |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2) Order to Show Cause adjourned to October 7, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Beaulieu Affidavit Exhibit C |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Beaulieu Affidavit Exhibit B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.