Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
David Franz, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sinicki, Michael Scott, Jensen, Sophie Anne, against Amy Franz, represented by Abbott, Rachel Ann, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts Tioga County Supreme Courtwith Gerald A Keene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald A Keene Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Filing Court HouseTioga County Supreme Court |
Matter TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time180 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.