Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Quicken Loans Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, against Todd Jobson, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Eugene D Faughnan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEugene D Faughnan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: May 17, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 22, 2018NOTICE
Date: August 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Referee Report of SAle | ||
May 17, 2022 | Foreclosure Action Surplus Monies Form | ||
December 20, 2021 |
ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE Order - Appointing Successor Referee |
||
August 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
May 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
March 24, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Foreclosure Status/Settlement Conference Administrative Order 157/20 |
||
March 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 24, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Notice of Conversion to Electronic E-filing |
||
February 19, 2021 | Affirmation pursuant to Administrative Order 157/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.