Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Gerald A. Keene presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald A. Keene Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 26, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time247 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT KEENE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
|
April 24, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED KEENE (Court Activity) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
|
January 28, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE KEENE (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
|
January 11, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE KEENE (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
|
December 17, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE KEENE (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
|
November 26, 2018 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE KEENE (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. GERALD A. KEENE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.