Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Elizabeth Malave Santos, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Lp, Walmart Supercenter Store #2547, represented by Cavanagh, Michael Patrick, Crummey, Carol Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Stephan G. Schick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephan G. Schick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises T&Amp;F) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 24, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 03, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 22, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 12, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Please note the next virtual conference date of January 30, 2023, at 1:30 pm. |
||
January 05, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next in person conference on January 18, 2023, at 2 pm. |
||
October 28, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of December 15, 2022, at 11:30 am. |
||
October 12, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of October 20, 2022, at 11 am. |
||
October 03, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
July 22, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of September 29, 2022, at 11:30 am. |
||
April 14, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of July 20, 2022, at 11 am. |
||
January 12, 2022 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of April 14, 2022, at 10:30 am. |
||
November 29, 2021 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Please note the preliminary conference date of January 11, 2022, at 3pm. |
||
October 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.