Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chad A. Campbell, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Kathawala, Rene A., Swartz, Rochelle Frieda, against Tina M. Stanford, represented by Rubinstein, Heather Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Stephan G. Schick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephan G. Schick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
PETITION *Corrected*
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT *Corrected*
Date: May 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT *Corrected*
Date: May 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Transcript of Proceedings Re Order to Show Cause |
||
August 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order |
||
August 23, 2021 | Informational Statement | ||
August 23, 2021 | Notice of Appeal of 7/19/21 Decision and Order | ||
July 22, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 14, 2021 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
June 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
June 24, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Petitioner's Motion for Disclosure |
||
June 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Disclosure and of Good Faith Conferral |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.