Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Luzon Oil Company Inc., D B A Luzon Environmental Services, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perlmutter, Bruce, against Keiser Restaurant Supplies, Inc. D B A Keiser Restaurant Equipment, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin Bryant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin Bryant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 13, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE correspondence to judge requesting new date for inquest. |
||
January 09, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 13, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 02, 2022 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
June 17, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Letter to Keiser Restaurant Supplies LLC-rejecting alleged Answer |
||
June 16, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 07, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Notice letter with the affidavit of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.