Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Steven Foley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fagen, Ryan Andrew Scott, against Joseph Nebzydoski, Kerry Jo Nebzydoski, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with David Gandin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Gandin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance - fully executed |
||
March 16, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
March 15, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
March 09, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
October 28, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 05, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 31, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 08, 2021 | Answer | ||
June 08, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
June 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney Verification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.