Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Leon Benson, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Breslow, Lawrence Andrew, against Best Western Monticello, Ohm, Llc, Pramukh Hospitality, Inc., represented by Arcuri, Andrew Anthony, Ondrovic, Karen A., in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Stephan G. Schick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephan G. Schick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall Down) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 24, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 25, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 08, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 13, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 27, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 01, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 30, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 31, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 23, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: May 11, 2023DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: May 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 07, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of July 20, 2023, at 4 pm. |
||
May 16, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of May 31, 2023, at 10 am. |
||
May 15, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) Jury Demand |
||
May 11, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
April 25, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of May 11, 2023, at 3:30 pm. |
||
April 07, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Schick |
||
March 22, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of April 13, 2023, at 10:30 am. |
||
March 13, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of March 8, 2023, at 2:30 pm. |
||
March 02, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 23, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.