Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Usalliance Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Cember, William A, against Branden Brown Aka Branden Thomas Brown, Branden Brown Aka Branden Thomas Brown, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit |
||
August 25, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor | ||
August 25, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
August 25, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment |
||
June 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service |
||
May 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 05, 2021 | Summons with Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.