Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ryen, Matthew Adam, Stein, Mark H, against Christy M Walker, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin Bryant presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin Bryant Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
June 29, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Order awarding Attorney's Fees and authorizing Entry of Default Judgment |
||
June 29, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Plaintiff Affidavit in Support of Motion |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) *Corrected* Payment Ledger Redacted per 22 NYCRR Payment Ledger Redacted |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) *Corrected* Notice of Balance Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Balance Due Redacted |
||
January 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Default Judgment |
||
January 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) *Corrected* Affidavit of Non-Military Status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.