Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Mauro Carraccia, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 12, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
||
February 17, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
||
February 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 06, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT April Scardino |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.