Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No 15 Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Rebecca Kaiser, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 18, 2021 | Affidavit of Purchase and Sale of Account by Debt Buyer Plaintiff (Debt Buyer Actions) | ||
November 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
November 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 18, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
November 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
September 27, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
September 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 04, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.