Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Debra K Schillings, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Rite Aid Of New York, Inc., represented by Cha, Annie, Rubine, Seth Brian, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Stephan G. Schick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephan G. Schick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER
Date: May 25, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
November 12, 2020 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of February 4, 2020, at 11 am. |
||
November 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
October 14, 2020 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of November 12, 2020, at 2:30 pm. |
||
October 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
September 03, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 03, 2020 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Please note the next conference date of October 14, 2020 at 10:30 am. |
||
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
July 28, 2020 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC- September 3, 2020, at 12pm, via Skype. |
||
July 21, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.