Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Jordan, Tarah Eve, Leiderman, Joel D, against Erin Dodge, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions319 days |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 06, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
February 09, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 21, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
December 21, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
||
December 21, 2020 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 21, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
||
December 21, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
December 21, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
December 14, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.