Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mtglq Investors Lp, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Request For Court Hearing) case represented by Druckman, Stuart L, against Zumber Selimaj Aka, Zumber Selimanjin Aka, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2018 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Request For Court Hearing) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY DOCS |
||
May 07, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E FILING |
||
March 24, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
March 24, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 24, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COVER LETTER |
||
March 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY DOCS |
||
March 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COSTS OF PLAINTIFF |
||
March 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER CONFIRMING REFERES REPORT AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE, SCHREIBMAN, 2/28/2020 |
||
March 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
March 12, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT A - S EXHIBIT A - S Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.