Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Schick, Hon. Stephan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchick, Hon. Stephan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2015 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time608 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Schick (Court Activity) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
December 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
November 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
October 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
October 06, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 12/05/2016Decided Before Justice: Schick, Hon. Stephan Answer demanded: No Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
July 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
July 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
June 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
June 17, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 07/16/2015Decided Before Justice: Schick, Hon. Stephan Answer demanded: No Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
April 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Default Schick (Settlement Conference) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.