Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Schick, Hon. Stephan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchick, Hon. Stephan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management785 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryRp-Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
March 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002)
Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
March 12, 2020 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 03/17/2020Settled Before Justice: Schick, Hon. Stephan Answer demanded: No Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
December 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Schick (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
November 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Schick (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
September 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Schick (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
July 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Schick (Motion Part) Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
|
July 26, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 09/05/2017Decided Before Justice: Schick, Hon. Stephan Answer demanded: No Judge: Schick, Hon. Stephan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.