Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eric Cox Po, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Daniel Andali, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Stephen L. Braslow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen L. Braslow Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Extreme Risk Protection Order |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time7 days |
APPLICATION - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY)
Date: December 19, 2019ORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY-GRANTED)
Date: December 19, 2019NOTICE - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (HEARING-AMEND/VACATE)
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (FINAL-GRANTED) | |
December 26, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP-PRE NOTE HEARING PART 58 ERPO-F O/S EXPIRES 12/18/2020 Judge: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER |
|
December 26, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) MOTION PART 58 O/S EXP 12/18/20 Judge: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY) Redacted |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY-GRANTED) Redacted |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (HEARING-AMEND/VACATE) Redacted |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER APPLICATION Redacted |
|
December 19, 2019 | Motion |
TEMP - EXT RISK PROT ORDER (Motion #001) Decided: 12/19/2019MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER Answer demanded: No Judge: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER |
|
December 19, 2019 | Motion |
FINAL - EXT RISK PROT ORDER (Motion #002) Decided: 12/26/2019MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER Answer demanded: No Judge: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER |
|
December 19, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 58 Judge: STEPHEN L. BRASLOW/ER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.