Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kenneth Leuck As Administrator Of The Estate Of, Sharon A. Leuck Deceased And On Behalf Of Decedent'S Distributees, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Glass, Michael Gerard, against Nursing Sisters Home Visiting Service, Inc. D B A Catholic Home Care, Suffolk Restorative Therapy And Nursing, Llc D B A Momentum At South Bay For Rehabilitation And Nursing, represented by Benvenuto, Thomas J, Schiralli, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Peter H Mayer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H Mayer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Cycle Time856 days |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 03, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2017 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance |
||
May 23, 2017 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Conference Calendar Part 17 SBT, $200,000 (Conversion) Judge: Mayer, Hon. Peter H. |
|
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP-PRE NOTE CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 17 SBT $200,000 Judge: PETER H. MAYER |
|
October 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Conf Part 34 O/C LECLAIR LTR (Conversion) Judge: Pastoressa, Hon. Joseph C. |
|
October 19, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 34 O/C LECLAIR LTR Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Conf Part 34 O/C LECLAIR LTR (Conversion) Judge: Pastoressa, Hon. Joseph C. |
|
September 07, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 34 O/C LECLAIR LTR Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
June 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Conf Part 34 Judge: Pastoressa, Hon. Joseph C. |
|
June 29, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 34 Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.