Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Marie Mattera, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Bass, Brian David, against Frank C. Perry As Executor Of The Estate Of Louis Caputo, Deceased, represented by Kennedy, Denis J, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Paul M Hensley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul M Hensley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: March 10, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 04, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE matter had been discontinued |
||
November 29, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stip discon |
||
September 12, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 9/29/2022 ADR2 TEAMS CONFERENCE CALENDAR |
||
September 12, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand |
||
July 11, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 7/28/2022 ADR2 TEAMS CONFERENCE CALENDAR |
||
April 04, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to ADR Order |
||
March 31, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A attachments |
||
March 10, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
December 02, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.