Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amanda Bonkoski, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kelly, Sean Patrick, against Jeffrey Aurelio, Jennifer Aurelio, represented by Kartzinel, Steven Roy, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Paul M Hensley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul M Hensley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 02, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
April 26, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 11, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 04, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 01, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
April 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
December 21, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
November 23, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.