Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Salvatore Frank Leggio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Siben, Andrew B., against Amancio N. Aristondo, Jonathan A. Aristondo, represented by Champness, Abigail, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Adr Alternate Dispute Resolution presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdr Alternate Dispute Resolution Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: August 01, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 01, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 8/16/2022 ADR 1 Teams Meeting |
||
July 28, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Supplemental Notice for Discovery & Inspection |
||
April 06, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to ADR Referral Order and Combined Demands Redacted per 22 NYCRR Response to ADR Referral Order and Combined Demands Redacted |
||
March 14, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
January 13, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Supplemental Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
December 09, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for RJI & PC Request |
||
December 09, 2021 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
||
December 01, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.