Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
E. P.R. Minor By Her Mother And Natural Guardian, Santos Reyes, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Abreu, Joan Elizabeth, Cannon, Patrick William, Kennedy, Colleen Marie, Redeker, June, against Demetrios Bouroutis, Helen Bouroutis, represented by Jones, Matthew Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Joseph Farneti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Farneti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: August 26, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: August 18, 2022AFFIRMATION *Corrected*
Date: August 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 16, 2022 |
ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE (Motion #003) Signed |
||
August 26, 2022 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) | ||
August 18, 2022 | STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION | ||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* Affirmation of Attorney |
||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* Affidavit of Guardian |
||
August 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Ex A: offer letter |
||
August 17, 2022 |
INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #003) *Corrected* ICO |
||
June 10, 2022 |
STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION Stipulation to Amend Caption |
||
January 14, 2021 | Hearing |
CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 37 PERCHMB Judge: JOSEPH FARNETI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.