Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with James C. Hudson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames C. Hudson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time1125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2017 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL CALENDAR CONTROL PART PEND SETT Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
June 20, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
May 08, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
April 18, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PT RESERVE PRETRIAL RESERVE Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
October 12, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) PN MOTION PT 40 EFILED/PIP MVT:PACHINGER S Judge: JAMES HUDSON |
|
September 28, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PN MOTION PT 40 EFILED/PIP MVT:PACHINGER S Judge: JAMES HUDSON |
|
August 24, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PN MOTION PT 40 EFILED/PIP MVT:PACHINGER S Judge: JAMES HUDSON |
|
July 13, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PN MOTION PT 40 EFILED MVT:PACHINGER S Judge: JAMES HUDSON |
|
July 08, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) PN MOTION PT 40 EFILED MVT:PACHINGER S Judge: JAMES HUDSON |
|
June 13, 2016 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 01/18/2017MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: JAMES HUDSON Answer demanded: No Judge: JAMES HUDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.