Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chrischar, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Dalli, Kathryn M., against Brian M. Donaghy, John Dios , Individually, And As Trustee Of The John Dios Living Trust, Lauren Donaghy, Rosemarie Dios , Individually, And As Trustee Of The Rosemarie Dios Living Trust, represented by Furey, James M., Laibowitz, Danielle Beth, Strunk, Nica Bettina, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher Modelewski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher Modelewski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Adverse Possession) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: July 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Stipulation adjourning motion to April 3, 2023 |
||
February 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Renew |
||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affirmation of Nica B. Strunk |
||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Defendant Brian M. Donaghy |
||
February 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Photo of new driveway on 40 Elm St. with annotations |
||
February 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order entered 2/3/2023 |
||
February 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 26, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 25, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 13, 2023 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.