Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Hughette Clarke, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Mitev, Vesselin Venelinov, Ray, John William, against Daniel Virgilio, George Cosentino, Gerard Glass Esq., Luigi Cosentino, Vincent Cosentino, (total of 5) See All represented by D'Addario, Joseph Ralph, Giusto, Raymond Anthony, Marshall, Adam Matthew, Nicolazzo, Adam M, Scher, Brett A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with David T. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid T. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Fraud) |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. The plaintiff, Hughette Clarke, is suing Luigi Cosentino, Vincent Cosentino, George Cosentino, Daniel Virgilio, and Gerard Glass, Esq. The comp...
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 19, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 30, 2018ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 30, 2018ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 13, 2018SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: July 30, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 27, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 26, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - i
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 18, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: August 11, 2023EXTRACT
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: August 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected*
Date: May 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected*
Date: May 12, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 08, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 01, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 08, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 09, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 01, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 25, 2020ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: December 10, 2019ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: April 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 12, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Pl's Reply Affirmation and back |
||
October 16, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B 7-27-09 Remuzzi Letter |
||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Reconveyance Deed |
||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A 5-10-23 Trial Transcript |
||
October 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 22, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #004) | ||
September 18, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Trial Extract |
||
September 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Deed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.