Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cit Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Jadwiga Szajner, Andrew T. Garbarino, Andrew Reed Garbarino, Marsha Simone Cato, (total of 5) See All against Any And All Persons Unknown To Plaintiff, Claiming, Or Who May Claim To Have An Interest In Or General Or Specific Lien Upon The Real Property Described In This Action; Such Unknown Persons Being Herein Generally Described And Intended To Be Included In T, Colleen Robitaille, As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Eileen Kuhlmeier, Elizabeth Barone, As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Eileen Kuhlmeier, James W. Kuhlmeier, Jr., As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Eileen Kuhlmeier, Kelly Laterra, As Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Eileen Kuhlmeier, (total of 9) See All represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, Corey James Robson, Vincent J. Messina Jr, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with John H Rouse presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn H Rouse Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions849 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time840 days |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: August 06, 2018REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: July 26, 2018FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: July 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2019 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE/FORM RECEIVED FIDUCIARY CLERK OFFICE NO SURPLUS 7/26/18 S&U/270,000 Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
January 04, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED FIDUCIARY CLERK OFFICE FINAL CMP DT FOR SMF Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
August 06, 2018 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE w/ pub & post |
||
July 26, 2018 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
July 26, 2018 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
June 27, 2018 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
June 22, 2018 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE SALE DATE Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
June 04, 2018 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
May 09, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
May 09, 2018 | Notice of Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.