Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Juan Sinchi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Manolakis, Michael Nikolas, Mclaughlin, Kyle J, against Holly A. Gibbs, represented by Fitzpatrick, James E., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Adr Alternate Dispute Resolution presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdr Alternate Dispute Resolution Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 22, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 11, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 7/26/2022 ADR 1 Teams Meeting |
||
February 28, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
October 26, 2021 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC Request |
||
October 26, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for RJI & Request for PC |
||
October 26, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C |
||
July 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.