Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Esther Flury Darribere, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Scharoff, Jerome Alan, Suffolk, Court Attorney, against Cyril Darribere, represented by Owen, Christopher Taylor, Petroske, Clifford J., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Michael Gajdos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Gajdos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION OF ENGAGEMENT | ||
December 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 05, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 30, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 25, 2023 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
May 25, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - 19 | ||
May 25, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 25, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - 18 | ||
May 25, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - 17 | ||
April 28, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.