Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brian Curran, Christopher Loper, Rian Loper, Shanon Loper, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Russell, Frank, against Brian Loper, Loper'S East End, Llc, Wayne Loper Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Edward Loper, Wayne Loper Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Edward Loper, represented by Amadio, Alfred Joseph, Canzoneri, Patricia Marie, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Constructive Trust) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 14, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
October 01, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer |
||
August 04, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
July 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 14, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.