Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Owner Trustee Of Csmc 2017-Rpl2 Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against American Express Centurion Bank, And John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, And John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Capital One Bank Usa, Na, Clerk Of The Suffolk County District Court, (total of 9) See All represented by Silver, Sharon Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher Modelewski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher Modelewski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
And John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002) withdrawal |
||
February 08, 2023 |
BILL OF COSTS Costs of Plaintiff |
||
February 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Department of Defense Search results Redacted per 22 NYCRR Department of Defense Search results Redacted |
||
February 08, 2023 | Affidavit of Service by Mail | ||
February 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q Attorney Fee Affirmation |
||
December 12, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) withdrawal |
||
November 29, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) adjournment |
||
October 21, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #002) Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
October 21, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Confirm Referee Report and a Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
October 21, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.