Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jose Guevara, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Abc Corporation, Bank Of America, National Association, represented by Poulis, Andre N, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with George Nolan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge Nolan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discontinuance |
||
October 28, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO APPEAR |
||
October 26, 2022 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
October 27, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 19, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 18, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 15, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.