Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gloria Ceren, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Leo, Donald W., against 7-Eleven, Inc., Brentwood Management Corp., represented by Schnepp, Charles M., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Stephen Hackeling presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen Hackeling Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip/Trip &Amp; Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
April 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Amended and Supplemental Bill of Particulars |
||
April 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) So Ordered Stipulation dated 3/8/23 |
||
April 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
April 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply with Certification of Word Count |
||
April 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
April 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
February 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Plaintiff's BP and Discovery Responses Plaintiff's BP and Discovery Responses Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
February 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Letters and E-Mail to Plaintiff's Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.