Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gary Nestler, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Arnoff, Harvey Albert, against David Zelouf, Sea Salt Holding, Llc, represented by Stolar, Brian Scott, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph Farneti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Farneti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 18, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Letter Request for Adjournment |
||
August 29, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 9/12/2022 ADR 1 Teams Conference |
||
July 19, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT 8/4/2022 ADR 1 Teams Meeting |
||
July 06, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT ADR 1 Teams Meeting |
||
March 14, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
December 10, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 10, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 10, 2021 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for RJI |
||
December 10, 2021 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Part 130 Certification for RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.