Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Daniel Denatale, D D, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cantarero, Jonathan, Herman, Jeffrey Marc, Rossman, Jenny Rebecca, Silvershein, Andrew Todd, Sparacino, Jessica D., (total of 5) See All against Bay Shore Union Free School District, Gardiner Manor Elementary School, represented by Kwee, David Ferdinand, Lobasso, Christine Ann, Silverman, Lewis Rand, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Ccp Justice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCcp Justice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York. The plaintiff, identified as D.D., is bringing a revival action for child sexual abuse under the New York Child Victims Act. The defendant named in the complaint ...
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Document being processed – check back in 15 minutes |
||
January 19, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
November 13, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 09, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED EXTEND DISCLOSURE DEADLINES |
||
November 08, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
October 16, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DISCOVERY |
||
August 11, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
July 20, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DATE SCHEDULE |
||
June 02, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DUE DATE EXTENSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.