Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hess, Stephanie, Jani, Bijal K, Nduka, Ijeoma O, against Clerk Of The Suffolk County District Court, Discover Bank, John And Jane Does, Matthew J Stone, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time521 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2015STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 29, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYSDTF |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CLERK OF THE SUFFOLK COUNTY |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT JOHN AND JANE |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) *Corrected* | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.