Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
The Estate Of Teresa Bua By Her Personal Representative, Anthony Lamastro, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Ciaccio, Joseph Leonard, against Abc Corporation, Abc Partnership, Oasis Rehabilitation And Nursing, Llc, represented by Andrews, Brian Michael, Braverman, Dylan Corey, Lobaito, Jennifer M., Shapiro, Lori Michele, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Professional Malpractice (Nursing Home Malpractice) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 28, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stip ETR 4.8.24 |
||
January 05, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 28, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION_ ALL ATTORNEYS |
||
September 28, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Bua - Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer |
||
June 22, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
June 22, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 28, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth Efiling |
||
March 28, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer |
||
March 06, 2023 |
FEDERAL COURT ORDER (COPY) remand back to State |
||
January 27, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.