Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Paul Buonagura, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brown, Jeffrey Kevin, Markowitz, Daniel Harris, Tompkins, Michael Alexander, against Fox Hill Country Club Caterers Inc., George Regini, George Regini Jr., Giorgio'S Catering Llc, represented by Eden, Ryan Michael, Zabell, Saul David, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with George Nolan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge Nolan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management161 days |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time986 days |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 14, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 01, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Appendix A |
||
September 14, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
September 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Affidavit of Iran Palmer |
||
August 30, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
August 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
July 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #004) Ex J - Hospitality Wage Order, 12 NYCRR Part 146 |
||
July 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) Ex I - Part 6 - Payroll Records Ex I - Part 6 - Payroll Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) Ex I - Part 5 - Payroll Records Ex I - Part 5 - Payroll Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) Ex I - Part 4 - Payroll Records Ex I - Part 4 - Payroll Records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.