Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anthony Bailey, Downstream Manufacturing & Outfitters, Inc., John Nuzzi, Leonard Panarelli Iii, Neil Nuzzi, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ward, Michael Christopher, against Golf Gear, Ltd. D B A Club Pro Manufacturing Usa, Stephen Tyrer, Steven Prehoda, represented by Craco, Paul V, Gathman, James Edward, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Elizabeth Emerson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Emerson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: January 10, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 23, 2021 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
January 21, 2021 | Hearing |
CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 44 10:30 AM/CHRE Judge: ELIZABETH H. EMERSON |
|
October 22, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 44 2:15 PM TEL CONF Judge: ELIZABETH H. EMERSON |
|
September 09, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 44 10:30 AM Judge: ELIZABETH H. EMERSON |
|
July 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 44 10:30 AM Judge: ELIZABETH H. EMERSON |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Defendants Stephen Tyrer and Golf Gear, Ltd. |
|
May 14, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 44 10:30AM Judge: ELIZABETH H. EMERSON/COMM |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.