Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Modern Leasing, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kaufman, Richard J, against Anthony Gagliardi, Anthony Vulpis, Frank Rotundo Jr., Nyc Materials Corp., Silver Star Haulers Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Edelman, Paul B., Gruder, Glenn Brian, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Ralph T Gazzillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph T Gazzillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management209 days |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions332 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time344 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 03, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - SETTLED HEARING PART 36 11 AM |
|
October 12, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED HEARING PART 36 11 AM Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
|
August 10, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED HEARING PART 36 11 AM Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
|
July 27, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED HEARING PART 36 Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
|
May 11, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED HEARING PART 36 11:00AM TRAVERSE HEARING Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
|
April 20, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED HEARING PART 36 PER KAUFMAN LTR TRAVERSE HEARING Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
|
March 16, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED HEARING PART 36 PER SFO 2/16/17 Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE (Motion #001) Referred to Hrg |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) MOTION PART 36 RTG MOTION- ADM ADJ. OSC Judge: PAUL J BAISLEY JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.