Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Basoglu, Mehmet, Spinelli, Victor, Tabakin, Gregg P, against John Doe #1-5 And Jane Doe #1-5, Jpmorgan Chase, N.A., Mark J. Dentale, Norma J. Dentale, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Daniel Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time344 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: May 08, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE | |
June 16, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) EXPARTE ORDER Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
|
June 08, 2015 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 06/25/2015CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: DANIEL MARTIN Answer demanded: No Judge: DANIEL MARTIN |
|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) ORDER TO CANCEL LIS PENDENS AND DISCONTINUE ACTION |
|
February 20, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - NOT SETTLED (U) FORECLOSURE PROG EAST/RIVERHEAD REFER TO IAS Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE JUSTICE |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibits for Request for Judicial Intervention |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non Military Service | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Mailing |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Merit for Request for Judicial Intervention | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.