Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Peter Malvica, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Pulis, Kyle Thomas, against Charles Scala, Darrel Kost Individually, Darrel Kost In His Official Capacity, Mark Hervan Individually, Mark Hervan In His Offical Capacity, (total of 9) See All represented by Hingerton, Patricia Mary, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Ccp Justice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCcp Justice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 22, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28
Date: November 10, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51
Date: November 10, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 14, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 03, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 03, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49
Date: November 10, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: September 22, 2022MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION)
Date: September 09, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: November 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 10/30/09 Letter
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 10, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Settlement signed 9/30/22 |
||
September 22, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
September 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
September 22, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Requesting the Court to "So Order" Settlement Agreement |
||
April 28, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 14, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 03, 2021 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Summary Judgment |
||
November 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 50 Jeanne Ellis Complaint Memos |
||
November 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.