Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Contractors Market, Inc., Joseph M Fischetti A K A Joseph Fischetti, Jp Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. C O Chase Home Finance Llc, Linda M Fischetti, Mr. Fischetti, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Thomas Whelan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Whelan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: May 15, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: March 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: June 29, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER
Date: October 25, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 07, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 07, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004) Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004) Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004) Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004) Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 12, 2023REFEREE REPORT - ATTORNEY
Date: May 15, 2023OATH
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: May 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Mailing Envelopes |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) O&R |
||
July 12, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Discharge Order |
||
July 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #004) BK Petition |
||
June 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
June 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #005) Exhibit J |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #005) Exhibit H |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Exhibit B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.