Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of New York Mortgage Agency, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Juan Carlos Arce, Liz Arce, Manufacturers And Traders Trust Company, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, United States Of America Acting Through The Irs, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A Santorelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A Santorelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 07, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 19, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Notice of Appearance |
||
July 19, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency Redacted |
||
April 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Conversion |
||
January 22, 2021 |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT) UPDATED |
||
January 07, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER CONVERSION ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.