Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barbara Calle As Administrator Of The Estate Of Lillian Gould, Lillian Gould, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Duffy, Mary Ellen, against Andrew Douglas Rogove M.D., Bernard Jay Nash M.D., Brian Scott Blaustein D.O., John Jane Doe M.D., Long Island Neurology, P.C., (total of 16) See All represented by Bloomstein, Larry David, Casey, Brian James, Dimartino, Theresa Maria, Isabella, Robert Lev, Lipton, Joyce S., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Ccp Justice presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCcp Justice Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 30, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for E-filing |
||
October 03, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Response |
||
September 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
September 07, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 02, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #007) Reply Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion to Renew the Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
April 25, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #007) FACTS |
||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #007) AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.