Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Thomas J Salvatore, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case against Brathwaite, Deborah Renne, Chief Clerk Of Southampton Town Justice Court, Weber, Gary J., Town Justice Of Southampton Town Justice Court, represented by O'Brien, Stephen Lee, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with William G Ford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam G Ford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: August 31, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Hearing |
SEE PART RULES
Judge: Martorana, Hon. Vincent J. |
|
September 02, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 01, 2021 |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT) UPDATED |
||
August 31, 2021 | ORDER - DISMISSAL | ||
August 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned Conference Calendar Part 38 MOTION PENDING (Conversion) Judge: Martorana, Hon. Vincent J. |
|
August 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #003) Motion Part EFILE, MVT:BRATHWAITE/WEBER, Case reassigned to Judge Martorana admin adj, admin adj Judge: Martorana, Hon. Vincent J. |
|
August 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Motion Part EFILE, MVT:BRATHWAITE/WEBER, Case reassigned to Judge Martorana admin adj Judge: Ford, Hon. William G. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Motion Part 38 EFILE, MVT:BRATHWAITE/WEBER (Conversion) Judge: Ford, Hon. William G. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Hearing |
Continued Conference Calendar Part 38 MOTION PENDING (Conversion) Judge: Ford, Hon. William G. |
|
April 20, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.